Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/27/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/24/2013