Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/22/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/02/2013