Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/27/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/27/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/10/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/15/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/10/2014