Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/11/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 06/17/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/03/2013