Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/17/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/03/2014