Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/30/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/02/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/19/2013