Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/09/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/30/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/02/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/02/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/19/2013