Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 01/13/2014