Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/04/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/18/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/19/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/10/2013