Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/16/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/10/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/08/2014