Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/23/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/26/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2013