Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/14/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 01/14/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/14/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/14/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/14/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/14/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/15/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/15/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/15/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/15/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/15/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 01/15/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/15/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/15/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/22/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/22/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/22/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/22/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/22/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 01/22/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/22/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/22/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/22/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/22/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/22/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 01/23/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/14/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/26/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/25/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew