There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2013)

Terrorism Risk Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2013 - Amends the Terrorism Risk Insurance Act of 2002 to extend from December 31, 2014, through December 31, 2024, the Terrorism Risk Insurance program.

Extends to September 30, 2027, the deadline by which the Secretary of the Treasury is required to collect all mandatory premiums for any act of terrorism occurring on or after January 1, 2012.

Requires reports in 2017, 2020, and 2023 on the findings of the President's Working Group on Financial Markets pursuant to an ongoing analysis regarding the long-term availability and affordability of (market conditions for) terrorism risk insurance.