Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/12/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/10/2014