Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/23/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/11/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/08/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/25/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/16/2013