Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/05/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/05/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/26/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/02/2013