Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/22/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/03/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/03/2014