Refine your search

Date Major Actions
11/13/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-48.
11/13/2013 Signed by President.
11/06/2013 Presented to President.
10/31/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7778)
10/30/2013 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report.
07/30/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5145-5146)
07/30/2013 Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-182.
05/22/2013 Introduced in House