Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/12/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/25/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/17/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 11/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/26/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/01/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/04/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/10/2014