Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/04/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/11/2013