Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/12/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/17/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2013