Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/10/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/19/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/13/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2014