Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/20/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/14/2013