Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/22/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/10/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/20/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/13/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/03/2014