Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/21/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/27/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/11/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 08/01/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 08/01/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/18/2013