Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/20/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/20/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/23/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2013