Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/04/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/25/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/26/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/26/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/06/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/26/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/03/2014