Refine your search

Date Chamber Actions
04/09/2014 SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation
09/10/2013 SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
09/09/2013-7:13pm HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 32, 1 Present (Roll no. 448). (text: CR H5411)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2013-6:47pm HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5416-5417)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2013-4:13pm HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2013-4:01pm HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2052.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2013-4:01pm HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5411-5414)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2013-4:01pm HouseMr. Terry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2013 HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
07/17/2013 HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
07/16/2013 HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
05/21/2013 HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
05/20/2013 HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2013 HouseIntroduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives