Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/08/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/31/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 08/01/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 08/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/16/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/23/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/02/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/13/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/04/2014