Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/16/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/23/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2013