Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/16/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/16/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/16/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/06/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/13/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 09/10/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/10/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/28/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/14/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 02/14/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/04/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/14/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/14/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/25/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/09/2014