Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/09/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/16/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/21/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/11/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew