Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/21/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/22/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/05/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/12/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/20/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/11/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/14/2013