Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/28/2013