Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/22/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/12/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/12/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/24/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew