Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 05/16/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/22/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/03/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/03/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/05/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/05/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/06/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/12/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/12/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/14/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/14/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/17/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/17/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/18/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/18/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/11/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/11/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/11/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/24/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/24/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 09/18/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/30/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/05/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew