Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/06/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/11/2013