Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/17/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/17/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/20/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/20/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/03/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/04/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/05/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/06/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/11/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/12/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/25/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/25/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/08/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/09/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/09/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/10/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/10/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/23/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 08/01/2013