Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/03/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/03/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/03/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/04/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/10/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/16/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/16/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/16/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/29/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/29/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/29/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/29/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/29/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 11/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/05/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/05/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/27/2014