Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/17/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/17/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/22/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/23/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/19/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/18/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/18/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/25/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 08/01/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 08/01/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 08/01/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 08/01/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 08/01/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/01/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 08/01/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/11/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/11/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/14/2014