Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 08/02/2013