Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/05/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/05/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/05/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/05/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/05/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/10/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/25/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/25/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/10/2014