Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/22/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/22/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/03/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/10/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/25/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/25/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/16/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/24/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 08/01/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/09/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/11/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/04/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/04/2014