Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/10/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/17/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/05/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/06/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/26/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/05/2014