Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/03/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/04/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/10/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 06/10/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/25/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/28/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/13/2014