Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/21/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/03/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/05/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/27/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew