Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/21/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/04/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/16/2013