Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 05/13/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/14/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/15/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/15/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/15/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/15/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/16/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/16/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/16/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/23/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/24/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/24/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/08/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/09/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/10/2014