Refine your search

Date Major Actions
08/09/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-28.
08/09/2013 Signed by President.
08/01/2013 Presented to President.
07/31/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 31 (Roll no. 426).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5214-5215)
07/24/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 7/23/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 18. Record Vote Number: 185.(text: CR S5894)
05/23/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 221 - 198 (Roll no. 183).
05/20/2013 Committee on Budget discharged.
05/20/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 113-82, Part I.
05/09/2013 Introduced in House