Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 05/09/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/16/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/16/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/16/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/21/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/22/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/24/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/05/2013